NH HB475 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/02/2017; Chapter 73; Eff. 8/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/02/2017; Chapter 73; Eff. 8/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to honoring Jessie Doe and Mary L.R. Farnum, the first women elected to the New Hampshire house of representatives.
Title
Relative to honoring Jessie Doe and Mary L.R. Farnum, the first women elected to the New Hampshire house of representatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/02/2017; Chapter 73; Eff. 8/1/2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 47 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1545e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 25 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1545e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/20/2017); Senate Journal 15 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 40 |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 14 |