NH HB473 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2017; Chapter 105; Eff. 1/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2017; Chapter 105; Eff. 1/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of gift certificates.
Title
Relative to the sale of gift certificates.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
Rep. Peter Spanos [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2017; Chapter 105; Eff. 1/1/2018 |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 9 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/18/2017); Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 05/02/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0310h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 13 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0310h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 13 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0310h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14 |