NH HB470 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fentanyl test strips and other drug checking equipment.
Title
Relative to fentanyl test strips and other drug checking equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 212 N: 161 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-01-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2422h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 212-161 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 91 |
2024-01-03 | House | FLAM # 2024-0041h (Rep. Hoell): Amendment Failed DV 178-194 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 91 |
2024-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2023-2422h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 88 |
2023-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-11-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2422h 11/15/2023 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 26 |
2023-11-09 | House | Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45A |
2023-11-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 44 |
2023-10-25 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 11/01/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 43 |
2023-10-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 42 |
2023-10-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/09/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 42 |
2023-10-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 40 |
2023-10-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 40 |
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/10/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 03:45 pm State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 17 |
Same As/Similar To
HB470 (Carry Over) 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee