NH HB464 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/11/2011; Effective 05/11/2011; Chapter 0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Signed by Governor 05/11/2011; Effective 05/11/2011; Chapter 0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the transfer of certain retirement system group II special account funds to the state annuity accumulation fund.
Title
Requiring the transfer of certain retirement system group II special account funds to the state annuity accumulation fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Ken Hawkins [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Raymond White [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - OTP (Y: 220 N: 80 NV: 98 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Signed by Governor 05/11/2011; Effective 05/11/2011; Chapter 0060 | |
2011-05-04 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318 | |
2011-04-27 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1370s (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1352 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.255 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1370s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.249 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Committee Amendment 1370s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.249 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1370s, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/31/11, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192 | |
2011-03-16 | House Reconsideration (Rep W.Smith): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.949 | |
2011-03-16 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-80; House Journal 28, PG.946-948 | |
2011-03-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.567 | |
2011-03-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 9-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.567 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/4/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-03-02 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 3/4/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 (Orig Legislative Office Building 201-203) | |
2011-02-09 | House ==CANCELLED==Executive Session: 2/18/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-02-08 | House ==CANCELLED==Full Committee Work Session: 2/18/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/11/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-02-02 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/11/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pensions Reform; House Journal 11, PG. 187 |