NH HB457 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 133; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 133; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the making, preservation, and Internet availability of audio and video recordings of proceedings of committees of the house of representatives.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the making, preservation, and Internet availability of audio and video recordings of proceedings of committees of the house of representatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 133; Eff: 06/25/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1660s (Rep. Wall): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1660s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1660s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1660s, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 220-147 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 25 |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 14-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 5 |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-14 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0599h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0599h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19 |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0599h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 12 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 15 |