NH HB454 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the membership and reporting responsibilities of the examining board of medicine.
Title
Relative to the membership and reporting responsibilities of the examining board of medicine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/18/2023; Senate Calendar 22 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 22 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16 |