NH HB447 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to school calendar days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to school calendar days.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 17
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 7
2019-02-21House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-20House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback