NH HB438 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the automatic union dues payment for state employees.
Title
Eliminating the automatic union dues payment for state employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. Bill Ohm [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 17 |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2018-01-09 | House | Special Order to next session day Without Objection House Journal 2 P. 47 |
2018-01-09 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2018-01-03 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoell) 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 26 |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB438 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)