NH HB434 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0436h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0436h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of public funds for abortions.
Title
Prohibiting the use of public funds for abortions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0436h |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 76 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91322816360 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 48 |