NH HB434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 235-105; House Journal 26, PG. 1247-1249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 235-105; House Journal 26, PG. 1247-1249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to review of proposed agency administrative rules by standing committees of the general court.
Title
Relative to review of proposed agency administrative rules by standing committees of the general court.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Rep. Frank Edelblut [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 235 N: 105 NV: 32 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 235-105; House Journal 26, PG. 1247-1249 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 8-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 433 |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 8:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration. |