NH HB431 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.
Title
Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Amanda Toll [D] | Rep. Brandon Phinney [L] | Rep. Jonah Wheeler [D] |
Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/18/2023; Senate Calendar 22 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0755h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 19 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0755h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 19 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0755h 03/08/2023 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 15 |