NH HB430 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition on entering or remaining on a public way or sidewalk adjacent to a reproductive health care facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the prohibition on entering or remaining on a public way or sidewalk adjacent to a reproductive health care facility.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseSpecial Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection
2021-02-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 31
2021-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/09/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96805083773 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 48

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback