NH HB429 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Lay HB429 on Table (Rep. Ellison): Motion Adopted DV 190-173 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the offering of breakfast and lunch in all public and chartered public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the offering of breakfast and lunch in all public and chartered public schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14HouseLay HB429 on Table (Rep. Ellison): Motion Adopted DV 190-173 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 44
2023-02-14HouseAmendment # 2023-0170h: Amendment Failed Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 44
2023-02-13HouseCommittee Report Without Recommendation: Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0170h (NT)
2023-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation 02/03/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 19
2023-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 02/03/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback