NH HB422 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Executive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the one-half credit required course in United States and New Hampshire government and civics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the one-half credit required course in United States and New Hampshire government and civics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/14/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-09-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2021-08-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/01/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2021-03-11HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832
2021-03-02HousePublic Hearing: 03/02/2021 10:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97910276071 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 47

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback