NH HB419 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to real estate leased for a public charter school.
Title
Relative to real estate leased for a public charter school.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 72 |
2017-03-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoell) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 11 |