NH HB415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing business taxes, repealing certain taxes, establishing an income tax, and requiring payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Title
Reducing business taxes, repealing certain taxes, establishing an income tax, and requiring payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 22 |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 11 |