NH HB414 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB414
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notifying parents of bullying incidents.
Title
Relative to notifying parents of bullying incidents.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] |
Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 36 |
2019-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 5 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB414 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar)