NH HB414 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to idling by commuter rail locomotives.
Title
Relative to idling by commuter rail locomotives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 506 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 243 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 222 |