NH HB413 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB413
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Reconsider HB 413 (Rep. Sandler): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-171 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Reconsider HB 413 (Rep. Sandler): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-171 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Title
Relative to payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - Reconsider (Y: 170 N: 171 NV: 24 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 172 N: 166 NV: 22 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - OTP (Y: 267 N: 83 NV: 19 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 172 N: 166 NV: 22 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - OTP (Y: 267 N: 83 NV: 19 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Reconsider HB 413 (Rep. Sandler): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-171 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 40 |
2018-01-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 172-166 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 30 |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-9; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-19 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-10-19 | House | Retained Bill Division I Work Session: 09/28/2017 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/28/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 39 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 267-83 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 39 |
2017-01-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-01-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/15/2017 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 20 |
2017-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 11 |
Same As/Similar To
HB413 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-9; Regular Calendar)