NH HB408 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 5/18/2015; Chapter 43; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Signed by the Governor on 5/18/2015; Chapter 43; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making a technical correction relative to fees for chiropractors and relative to the licensure of audiologists.
Title
Making a technical correction relative to fees for chiropractors and relative to the licensure of audiologists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/18/2015; Chapter 43; Effective Date 7/1/2015 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1778 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/30/2015); Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1407EBA (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1407e, New Title Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/9/15; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0260h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 786 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0260h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 786 |
2015-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0260h for Mar 11 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 400 |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-29 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 221 |