NH HB405 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/01/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99708430633 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/01/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99708430633 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to beer in refillable containers.
Title
Relative to beer in refillable containers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/01/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99708430633 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-01-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 34 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 3 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB405 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)