NH HB40 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB40 on Table (Rep. Berry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB40 on Table (Rep. Berry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to domicile residency, voter registration, and investigation of voter verification letters, and relative to the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."
Title
Relative to domicile residency, voter registration, and investigation of voter verification letters, and relative to the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Lay HB40 on Table (Rep. Berry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/28/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 24 |
2023-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Election Law |