NH HB399 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-29 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to pesticide use and notification in places where children play.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pesticide use and notification in places where children play.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-09-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 7-5; Regular Calendar)
2017-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 09/29/2017 Legislative Office Building 303
2017-09-12HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-08-29HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-08-29HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-02-14HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/14/2017 Legislative Office Building 303
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-01-11HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback