NH HB399 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB399
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 189-143 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 189-143 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pesticide use and notification in places where children play.
Title
Relative to pesticide use and notification in places where children play.
Sponsors
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Rep. John O'Day [R] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] | Rep. Robert Elliott [R] | Rep. Mark MacKenzie [D] | Rep. William Pearson [D] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-03 - House - ITL (Y: 189 N: 143 NV: 23 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 189-143 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 102 |
2017-09-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-09-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 7-5; Regular Calendar) |
2017-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 09/29/2017 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-09-12 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-08-29 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-08-29 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-02-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2017 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 10 |
Same As/Similar To
HB399 (Carry Over) 2017-09-29 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass