NH HB396 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to credits for certain energy production not issued renewable energy certificates.
Title
Relative to credits for certain energy production not issued renewable energy certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 83 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98218369454 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 46 |