NH HB392 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to constitutional convention procedures for delegates.
Title
Relative to constitutional convention procedures for delegates.
Sponsors
Rep. Jodi Newell [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0452h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 13 |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0452h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 13 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0452h 02/10/2023 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 8 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14 |