NH HB388 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 84; Eff: 08/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 84; Eff: 08/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to changing a pupil's school or assignment because of a manifest educational hardship.
Title
Relative to changing a pupil's school or assignment because of a manifest educational hardship.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 175 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 175 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 84; Eff: 08/17/2021 |
2021-06-11 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 21 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1890e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1890e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/03/2021); Senate Journal 19 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/27/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0923h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-175 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment # 2021-0923h: Amendment Adopted DV 359-13 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2021-03-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0923h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 40 |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832 |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97017007180 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 45 |