NH HB388 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 243-94 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 243-94 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring code compliance inspection for building permits.
Title
Requiring code compliance inspection for building permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 243-94 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 25 |
2019-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/14/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 9 |
2019-02-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 12 |