NH HB387 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Reconsider HB 387 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 179-187 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Reconsider HB 387 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 179-187 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for the developmental services system.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for the developmental services system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Reconsider (Y: 179 N: 187 NV: 5 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 182 N: 181 NV: 8 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 182 N: 181 NV: 8 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Reconsider HB 387 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 179-187 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 11 |
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-181 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Special Order to fourth order of business on 3/9/2017 (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 121 |
2017-03-02 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-03-02 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 15-10; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-01 | House | Division III Work Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-25 | House | Division III Work Session: 02/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 01/26/2017 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-19 | House | ==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Finance House Journal 3 P. 12 |