NH HB383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the prohibition on unlawful discrimination in public and nonpublic schools.
Title
Relative to the prohibition on unlawful discrimination in public and nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Connie Van Houten [D] |
Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0285h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 202-161 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 18 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0285h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 18 |
2019-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0285h (NT) for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB383 (Carry Over) 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study