NH HB383 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the prohibition on unlawful discrimination in public and nonpublic schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the prohibition on unlawful discrimination in public and nonpublic schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study
2019-05-02SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0285h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 202-161 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 18
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0285h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 18
2019-02-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0285h (NT) for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback