NH HB381 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB381
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 249; eff. 01/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 249; eff. 01/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to laboratory testing.
Title
Relative to laboratory testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 249; eff. 01/01/2023 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-2159s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2159s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2159s, 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/21/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 264-89 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 84 |
2021-03-11 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-11 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 49 |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing: 03/02/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99282187833 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 45 |
Same As/Similar To
HB381 (Carry Over) 2021-09-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2159s