NH HB381 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB381
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2159s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2159s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to laboratory testing.
Title
Relative to laboratory testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 264 N: 89 NV: 45 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2159s |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/21/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 264-89 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 84 |
2021-03-11 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-11 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 49 |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing: 03/02/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99282187833 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 45 |
Same As/Similar To
HB381 (Carry Over) 2021-09-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2159s