NH HB378 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Lay on Table (Rep. Porter): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 251-99 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Raising the minimum age for marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raising the minimum age for marriage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - Table (Y: 251 N: 99 NV: 10 Abs: 40) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseLay on Table (Rep. Porter): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 251-99 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 53
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0957h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 18
2019-03-06House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2019-02-26House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-02-13HousePublic Hearing: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback