NH HB377 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB377

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the best interests of the child under the child protection act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the best interests of the child under the child protection act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 255 N: 115 NV: 8 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2815h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 255-115 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 58
2020-01-09HouseAmendment # 2019-2815h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 58
2019-10-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-10-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2815h (NT) (Vote 14-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50
2019-10-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-09-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-08-26HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-14HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 12

Same As/Similar To

HB377 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback