NH HB376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB376
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study best practices for companion animal groomers.
Title
Establishing a committee to study best practices for companion animal groomers.
Sponsors
Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] | Rep. Catherine Sofikitis [D] | Rep. Patricia Bushway [D] |
Rep. Brian Chirichiello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2787h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 41 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2787h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 41 |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2787h (NT) (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 |
2019-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB376 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2787h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar)