NH HB376 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB376
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2787h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2787h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study best practices for companion animal groomers.
Title
Establishing a commission to study best practices for companion animal groomers.
Sponsors
Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Brian Chirichiello [R] | Rep. Catherine Sofikitis [D] | Rep. Patricia Bushway [D] |
Rep. Jim Maggiore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2787h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB376 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2787h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar)