NH HB372 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB372

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to construction of the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to construction of the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Committee Amendment 2536s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - Print Remarks (Y: 274 N: 79 NV: 9 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - OTP (Y: 188 N: 163 NV: 11 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateConference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-15House==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2018-05-14HouseConferee Change: Rep. Negron Replaces Rep. Silber 05/10/2018
2018-05-14HouseConferee Change: Rep. Hill Replaces Rep. Wells 05/10/2018
2018-05-11House==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 11:45 am State House 103
2018-05-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Gray, Soucy; (In Recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-10SenateSen. Gray Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-04-26HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. B. Griffin, Freeman, Wells, Silber 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2
2018-04-26HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2536s and Requests CofC (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2
2018-01-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2536s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2017-2536s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2017-12-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2536s, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48
2017-05-31SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/31/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25
2017-03-15SenateHearing: 03/21/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:20 am; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-163 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 83
2017-03-02HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-03-02HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-01-31HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 11

Same As/Similar To

HB372 (Carry Over) 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2536s

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=10&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB372
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=21&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=21
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=62&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=HB0372&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB372&ddlsponsors=&lsr=10
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=63&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=HB0372&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB372&ddlsponsors=&lsr=10
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=6&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0372&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB372&ddlsponsors=&lsr=10
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=7&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0372&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB372&ddlsponsors=&lsr=10

Bill Comments

feedback