NH HB372 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2536s
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to construction of the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to construction of the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - House - Print Remarks (Y: 274 N: 79 NV: 12 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - OTP (Y: 188 N: 163 NV: 14 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2536s
2017-05-31SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/31/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25
2017-03-15SenateHearing: 03/21/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:20 am; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-163 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 83
2017-03-02HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-03-02HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-01-31HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback