NH HB371 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 242; Eff. 9/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 242; Eff. 9/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to bond requirements for public works contracts.
Title
Relative to bond requirements for public works contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 242; Eff. 9/16/2017 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2367c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2367c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2367c; 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-06-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/12/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Bradley, Watters; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Chandler, McConkey, J. Graham, Ebel 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1368s and Requests CofC (Rep. Chandler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1368s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1368s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1368s, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0418h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 43 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0418h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 43 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0418h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2017 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 10 |