NH HB370 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB370
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to after market window tinting on motor vehicles for drivers with medical conditions.
Title
Relative to after market window tinting on motor vehicles for drivers with medical conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2395h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 68 |
2024-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2023-2395h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 68 |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2395h 10/31/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 21 |
2023-10-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 43 |
2023-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 43 |
2023-09-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 House Calendar 38 |
2023-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB370 (Carry Over) 2023-09-21 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 House Calendar 38