NH HB362 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB362

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-20HouseInterim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 15-0)
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/23/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/99116539335 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-01-08HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 57
2019-10-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-10-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 14-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 17
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-09-23HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 46

Same As/Similar To

HB362 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback