NH HB362 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.
Title
Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] |
Rep. Robert Harb [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-10-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 14-1; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-09-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 46 |
Same As/Similar To
HB362 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass