NH HB361 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 09/08/2013; Chapter 0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 09/08/2013; Chapter 0210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to worksharing.
Title
Relative to worksharing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 09/08/2013; Chapter 0210 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1969e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1648 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1969e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-22 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1407s (Rep A.White): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1463 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1407s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1407s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1407s, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: === ROOM CHANGE === 4/9/13, Room 100, State House, 1:40 p.m. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced 2/14/2013 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.465 |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 20 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.266 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.192 |