NH HB359 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. McLean): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. McLean): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Creating a private cause of action for discrimination based on hairstyles relative to a person's ethnicity.
Title
Creating a private cause of action for discrimination based on hairstyles relative to a person's ethnicity.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. McLean): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2165h |
2021-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB359 09/28/2021 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 35 |
2021-09-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-09-08 | House | Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91322816360 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 44 |
Same As/Similar To
HB359 (Carry Over) 2021-09-09 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=130&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB359 |