NH HB359 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-09 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-09 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a private cause of action for discrimination based on hairstyles relative to a person's ethnicity.
Title
Creating a private cause of action for discrimination based on hairstyles relative to a person's ethnicity.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-09-08 | House | Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91322816360 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 44 |
Same As/Similar To
HB359 (Carry Over) 2021-09-09 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208