NH HB358 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 228; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 228; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to driver's license information obtained by pawnbrokers and secondhand dealers.
Title
Relative to driver's license information obtained by pawnbrokers and secondhand dealers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 228; Effective Date 9/11/2015 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2327e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2138 |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2327e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1349s (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1349s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1349s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1349s, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1349s, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 100, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 835 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 414 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2015 2:05 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 219 |