NH HB357 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspending the payment of travel expenses for legislators and staff.
Title
Suspending the payment of travel expenses for legislators and staff.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.415 | |
2011-09-21 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2207 | |
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 9/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/20/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-02-22 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2011 Legislative Office Building 104 12:00 PM or Following House Session | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 183 |