NH HB352 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to operation of recreational vehicles on state highways.
Title
Relative to operation of recreational vehicles on state highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 85 |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99182085994 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 44 |