NH HB352 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Finance Division 1 Work Session: 01/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriating funds to the department of environmental services for the purpose of funding eligible wastewater projects under the state aid grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriating funds to the department of environmental services for the purpose of funding eligible wastewater projects under the state aid grant program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseFinance Division 1 Work Session: 01/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Finance

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback